Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKQED INC. v. United States Customs and Immigration Services et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv01628
Date Filed2020-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Sallie Kim
PlaintiffKQED INC.
Case DescriptionSasha Khokha, a reporter for KQED, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the A-file for Jose Guzman. Khokha provided a third-party authorization from Guzman. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Because Khokha submitted a second identical request, the agency told Khokha that it was closing one request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, KQED filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Customs and Immigration Services
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-051COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. section 552 et seq. against United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14251197.). Filed byKQED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/5/2020) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-052Proposed Summons. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/5/2020) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-063Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/20/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-066Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2020 01:30 PM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-094Rule 7.1 Disclosures by KQED INC. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-095CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by KQED INC... (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-097Summons Issued as to United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-04-028STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint to May 26, 2020 filed by United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 4/2/2020) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-039CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security.. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 4/3/2020) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-05-1210STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to (1) Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and (2) Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-1311ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 10 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/20/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-06-1212STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to (1) Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and (2) Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 6/12/2020) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-1513ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 12 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2020 01:30 PM. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020) Modified on 6/15/2020 (mklS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-07-2014STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to (1) Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and (2) Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 7/20/2020) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-2115ORDER by Judge Sallie Kim granting 14 Stipulation as Modified. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-22Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 9/21/2020 01:30 PM. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-08-2016STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to (1) Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and (2) Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-2417ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 16 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/19/2020 01:30 PM. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020) (Entered: 08/24/2020)
2020-09-1818STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to (1) Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and (2) Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Choe, Shiwon) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-2119ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 18 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/23/2020 01:30 PM. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-10-0720NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Valerie Elizabeth Smith (Smith, Valerie) (Filed on 10/7/2020) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-2721STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER extending defendants' time to respond to the complaint and continue case management conference sine die and set date for status letter filed by United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Smith, Valerie) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-2722Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 21 Stipulation Extending Defendants Time to Respond to the Complaint, Continuing Case Management Conference Sine Die and Setting a Date for Status Letter. Parties to file a status update by no later than 12/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 11/23/2020 is reset to 2/1/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-12-2223STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER continuing the joint status letter and the case management conference filed by United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Smith, Valerie) (Filed on 12/22/2020) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2020-12-2824ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 23 Stipulation Continuing Deadline for Joint Status Letter and Case Management Conference. Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2021. Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/22/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2021-02-1125STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by United States Customs and Immigration Services. (Smith, Valerie) (Filed on 2/11/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-1226ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 25 Stipulation Continuing 1) Deadline for Joint Status Letter and 2) Initial Case Management Conference. Status Report due by 4/1/2021. Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2021. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 4/26/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-2227STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: attorneys fees and costs resolution filed by United States Customs and Immigration Services. (Smith, Valerie) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-2228ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 27 Stipulation Regarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs Settlement. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-04-1229STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of dismissal with prejudice filed by United States Customs and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Smith, Valerie) (Filed on 4/12/2021) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar