Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBARTLETT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00665
Date Filed2020-03-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffLAWRENCE BARTLETT
Case DescriptionLawrence Bartlett, an agency employee, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt and asked Bartlett for clarification, which he provided. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Bartlett filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-061COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6895592) filed by LAWRENCE BARTLETT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-06Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-062SUMMONS(3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-263RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/11/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/10/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/23/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/16/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sara Kaiser Creighton)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar