Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCampaign Legal Center v. Bureau of the Census
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2020cv00625
Date Filed2020-03-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Charles B. Day
PlaintiffCampaign Legal Center
Case DescriptionThe Campaign Legal Center submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Bureau of the Census for records concerning the use of state DMV data for the census. CLC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency later granted CLC's request for a fee waiver. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, CLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantBureau of the Census
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-061COMPLAINT against Bureau of the Census ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8557517.), filed by Campaign Legal Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet, # 13 Summons (as to Attorney General), # 14 Summons (as to Bureau of the Census), # 15 Summons (as to U.S. Attorney))(Danahy, Molly) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-062Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Campaign Legal Center (Danahy, Molly) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-103QC NOTICE: 1 Complaint,, filed by Campaign Legal Center was filed incorrectly. the Proposed Summons were altered; please re-submit corrected summons, using notice (other) and link it to 1 Complaint (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-104NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day. Campaign Legal Center or counsel for Campaign Legal Center are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded here . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded here , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/24/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-105Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles B. Day on 3/10/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-106Summons Issued 30 days as to Bureau of the Census, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-127MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ruth Greenwood (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8567570.) by Campaign Legal Center(Danahy, Molly) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-128MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Danielle Lang (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8567594.) by Campaign Legal Center(Danahy, Molly) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-129MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey Zalesin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8567617.) by Campaign Legal Center(Danahy, Molly) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-1611PAPERLESS ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ruth Greenwood. Directing attorney Ruth Greenwood to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-1612PAPERLESS ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Danielle Lang. Directing attorney Danielle Lang to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-1613PAPERLESS ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeffrey Zalesin. Directing attorney Jeffrey Zalesin to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-1914SUMMONS Returned Executed by Campaign Legal Center. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration of Jeffrey Zalesin, # 2 Attachment Tracking Information Bureau of the Census, # 3 Attachment Tracking Information Attorney General, # 4 Attachment Tracking Information US Attorney)(Danahy, Molly) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
2020-03-2915NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah A Marquardt on behalf of Bureau of the Census (Marquardt, Sarah) (Entered: 03/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar