Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHornbuckle v. Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2020cv00362
Date Filed2020-03-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ricardo S. Martinez
PlaintiffStephen Hornbuckle
DefendantCenters for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-061SEALED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6195001) Attorney Stephen Hornbuckle added to party Stephen Hornbuckle(pty:pla), filed by Stephen Hornbuckle. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Hornbuckle, Stephen) Modified on 3/9/2020 sealed complaint due to un-redacted personal identifiers (CDA). (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-09Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (CDA) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-09NOTICE TO FILER: re 1 Complaint,. Document(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event Redacted Document located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (Page 13 of the Complaint contains personal identifiers) (CDA) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-092Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CDA) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-093REDACTED COMPLAINT to 1 Complaint, FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Plaintiff Stephen Hornbuckle (Hornbuckle, Stephen) Modified on 3/10/2020 to identify document as redacted complaint (PM). (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-264ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 5/7/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/23/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/30/2020, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar