Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRodriguez v. Scripps Health
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2020cv00439
Date Filed2020-03-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dana M. Sabraw
PlaintiffMarcella Rodriguez
Case DescriptionMariella Rodriguez filed suit against Scripps Health after the medical provider failed to provide records about her medical treatment. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantScripps Health
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-091COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Scripps Health, IFP Filed. Filed by Marcella Rodriguez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:20-cv-439-LAB-LL. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(sjt) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-092MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Marcella Rodriguez. (sjt) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-093MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcella Rodriguez. (sjt) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-174ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns, Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-02459-DMS-BLM. The new case number is 20cv0439-DMS-BLM. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/17/2020. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/12/2020. Motions set before Barbara Lynn Major.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar