Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Oversight v. Federal Bureau Of Investigation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv02088
Date Filed2020-03-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lewis A. Kaplan
PlaintiffAmerican Oversight
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications between the agency's New York field office and Rudy Giuliani or anyone acting on his behalf. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau Of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-091COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19051334)Document filed by American Oversight..(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-092CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-093RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Oversight..(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-094REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by American Oversight..(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-10CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-10Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-10Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-105ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(pc) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-04-016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Hilliard Dolinger on behalf of Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-027AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint served. Federal Bureau Of Investigation served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/15/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by American Oversight..(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar