Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00691
Date Filed2020-03-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Treasury and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency for records concerning appointment calendars and communications pertaining to various officials at each agency, referring to a number of outside entities and keywords. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from either agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantOFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-101COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6905256) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons U.S. Att'y General, # 4 Summons Dep't of the Treasury, # 5 Summons Office of the Comptroller of the Currency)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-11Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-113SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-124STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 12, 2020. (lccjn1) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar