Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBALDWIN v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00698
Date Filed2020-03-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffDOUGLAS BALDWIN
Case DescriptionDouglas Baldwin, a private investigator in California, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records responsive to two FOIA requests previously submitted by Thomson Reuters for records pertaining to Swoben v. Scan Health and Poehling v. United Health Group. Thomson Reuters asked DOJ if the requests could be transferred to Baldwin. The agency agreed to do so if Baldwin submitted his own request. DOJ told Baldwin that the responsive records were being withheld under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Baldwin filed an administrative appeal of the denial. DOJ upheld the denial based on Exemption 7(A. Baldwin then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-101COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6907117) filed by Douglas Baldwin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Summons to Attorney for DC, # 16 Summons to US Attorney General, # 17 Certificate of Service, # 18 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grif (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-122ERRATA by DOUGLAS BALDWIN 1 Complaint,, filed by DOUGLAS BALDWIN. (Griffinger, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-12Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-234MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lawrence S. Lustberg, Esq., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6944797. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOUGLAS BALDWIN (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lawrence S. Lustberg, Esq., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Griffinger, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-235MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Charlotte M. Howells, Esq., Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6944928. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOUGLAS BALDWIN (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charlotte M. Howells, Esq., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Griffinger, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar