Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmericans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2020cv21072
Date Filed2020-03-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Cecilia M. Altonaga
PlaintiffAmericans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.
Case DescriptionAmericans for Immigrant Justice submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning contracts between the agency and Larkin Community Hospital to provide medical services. AI Justice also requested a fee waiver. Although the agency did not initially acknowledge receipt of the request, it did provide a tracking number after AI Justice's counsel contacted the agency to check on the status of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AI Justice filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-101COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12581661, filed by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s), # 3 Summon(s), # 4 Summon(s), # 5 Summon(s), # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Norris, Allison) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-102Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-113Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (kpe) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-304ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 6/8/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar