Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBAILEY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS
DistrictMiddle District of Georgia
CityColumbus
Case Number4:2020cv00046
Date Filed2020-03-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUS DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND
PlaintiffCOLLIN C BAILEY
Case DescriptionCollin Bailey submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning his medical claims. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Bailey filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-101COMPLAINT filed by COLLIN C. BAILEY against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS. Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 42426 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 VA Documents)(tlf). (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-102Summonses issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN'S AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (tlf). (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-263MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint Filed by COLLIN C BAILEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit emails and documents from the Dept of Veteran Services, # 2 Proposed Amended Complaint, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(esl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2020: # 5 re-scan of Exhibit E) (esl). (Entered: 03/26/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar