Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLONG et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00701
Date Filed2020-03-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffSUSAN B. LONG
PlaintiffDAVID BURNHAM
Case DescriptionSusan Long and David Burnham, co-directors of the Transactional Records Access Clearinghouse (TRAC), submitted requests to the Department of Justice and the EPA for records concerning FOIA requests submitted through FOIA Online from October 2012 through September 2019. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. DOJ's Office of Information Policy told TRAC that it did not maintain records for requests submitted through FOIA Online because that system was operated by the EPA. TRAC filed an administrative appeal of OIP's no records response. After hearing nothing further from either agency, TRAC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-111COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6908678) filed by SUSAN B. LONG, DAVID BURNHAM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons EPA, # 3 Summons DOJ, # 4 Summons OUSA, # 5 Summons AG)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-12Case assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmc) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-122SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-123STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 12, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar