Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00706
Date Filed2020-03-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffOPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE
Case DescriptionThe Open Society Justice Initiative submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the denaturalization and deportation of American citizens from 1948 through 2018. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. DOJ's Criminal Division provided four documents, but all the other agency components did not respond. The Open Society Justice Initiative then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CIVIL DIVISION
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-111COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CIVIL DIVISION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CRIMINAL DIVISION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6911605) filed by OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet, # 14 Summons to USAG Barr, # 15 Summons to US Attorney Shea, # 16 Summons to Department of Homeland Security, # 17 Summons to Executive Office of the US Attorneys, # 18 Summons to US Citizenship and Immigration Services)(Carney, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-112MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Anthony W. Clark, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6911926. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Antony W. Clark, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-113MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elizabeth A. Molino Sauvigne, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6911931. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Molino Sauvigne, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-114MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey A. Mishkin, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6911937. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey Mishkin, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-115MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James A. Goldston, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6911966. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James A. Goldston, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-116MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laura Bingham, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6911974. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laura Bingham, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-117MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Natasha Arnpriester, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6911982. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Natasha Arnpriester, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-118MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sophia M. Mancall-Bitel, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6912000. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sophia M. Mancall-Bitel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-12Case assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmc) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-13MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), an attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice before this Court must submit a declaration that sets forth, inter alia : "(3) a list of all bars to which the attorney has been admitted; [and] (4) a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline." The declaration in support of Anthony W. Clark does not fully comply with elements (3) and (4) because it states that Mr. Clark has been admitted to and is in good standing with all of the courts listed in Schedule A, but no Schedule A or other document providing this information is attached to Mr. Clark's declaration. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 13, 2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-13MINUTE ORDER granting 3 4 5 6 7 8 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Elizabeth A. Molino Sauvigne, Jeffrey Mishkin, James A. Goldston, Laura Bingham, Natasha Arnpriester, and Sophia M. Mancall-Bitel are admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 13, 2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-139SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-1310Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Anthony W. Clark, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6918464. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anthony W. Clark, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carney, David) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-1311NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Sophia Morris Mancall-Bitel on behalf of OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE (Mancall-Bitel, Sophia) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-1312NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Elizabeth Anne Molino Sauvigne on behalf of OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE (Sauvigne, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-1313NOTICE of Appearance- Pro Bono by Jeffrey Mishkin on behalf of OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE (Mishkin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-13MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Anthony W. Clark is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 13, 20 20. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-1814NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony W. Clark on behalf of OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE (Clark, Anthony) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-1815NOTICE of Appearance by Natasha Arnpriester on behalf of OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE (Arnpriester, Natasha) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-1816NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-1817ERRATA by OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE 15 Notice of Appearance filed by OPEN SOCIETY JUSTICE INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Notice of Appearance)(Carney, David) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar