Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv02213
Date Filed2020-03-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Naomi Reice Buchwald
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the use of facial recognition at airports and the border. The ACLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency components acknowledged receipt of the request. ICE granted the ACLU's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
DefendantTransportation Security Administration
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-121COMPLAINT against Transportation Security Administration, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19090930)Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A).(Gorski, Ashley) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-122CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gorski, Ashley) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-123REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Gorski, Ashley) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-124REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Gorski, Ashley) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-125REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Transportation Security Administration, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Gorski, Ashley) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-126REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Gorski, Ashley) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-127RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Gorski, Ashley) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-13CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-13Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-13Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-138ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security..(pc) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-139ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection..(pc) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-1310ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(pc) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-1311ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Transportation Security Administration..(pc) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-2012NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Christopher Toomey on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Toomey, Patrick) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-03-2013NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nathan Freed Wessler on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Wessler, Nathan) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-03-2014NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Beth Haroules on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Haroules, Beth) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-03-2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Andrew Hodgson on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation..(Hodgson, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar