Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. United States Department of Commerce
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv01783
Date Filed2020-03-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
PlaintiffWill Carless
Case DescriptionWill Carless, a reporter for the Center for Investigative Reporting, submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Commerce for records concerning the 2020 Census. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of his request, Carless and CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Commerce
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-121COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against United States Department of Commerce, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971- 14275379). Filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting & Will Carless. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/12/2020) Modified on 3/13/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-122Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/12/2020) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-123Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Will Carless & The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/12/2020) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-124Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/26/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2020) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-135Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/4/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-136Summons Issued as to Defendant United States Department of Commerce. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-167CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Will Carless, The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/16/2020) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-168CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Will Carless, The Center for Investigative Reporting re 1 Complaint, (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 3/16/2020) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-04-219STIPULATION TO SET RESPONSE DATE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by United States Department of Commerce. (Bernardoni, Jevechius) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-04-2110CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Commerce.. (Bernardoni, Jevechius) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-04-2111Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 9 Stipulation To Set Response Date. Deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 5/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 6/11/2020 is reset to 7/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-05-1812ANSWER to Complaint for Injunctive Relief filed by United States Department of Commerce. (Bernardoni, Jevechius) (Filed on 5/18/2020) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-2813CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-06-2614ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-2915ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-3016ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bernardoni, Jevechius) (Filed on 6/30/2020) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-07-0717CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 09:30 AM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed. All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1614698626?pwd=eXlQRThFajBjT0tieVBaYWpjMjFodz09 Meeting ID: 161 469 8626 Password: 546984 Dial by your location +1 929 205 6099 US (New York) +1 253 215 8782 US +1 301 715 8592 US +1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago) +1 346 248 7799 US (Houston) +1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose) Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjo For important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (Related documents(s) 13 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associate d with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2020) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-0818CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING AND RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 7/16/2020 is reset to 8/13/2020 at 9:30 AM . Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2020. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed. All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1614698626?pwd=eXlQRThFajBjT0tieVBaYWpjMjFodz09 Meeting ID: 161 469 8626 Password: 546984 Dial by your location +1 929 205 6099 US (New York) +1 253 215 8782 US +1 301 715 8592 US +1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago) +1 346 248 7799 US (Houston) +1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose) Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjo For important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-08-0619INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of Commerce. (Bernardoni, Jevechius) (Filed on 8/6/2020) (Entered: 08/06/2020)
2020-08-1320CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The court continues the CMC for approximately 90 days to allow the parties to continue with their cooperative efforts. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 8/13/2020 is reset to 11/12/2020 at 9:30 AM . Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-11-0521CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of Commerce. (Bernardoni, Jevechius) (Filed on 11/5/2020) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-11Order resetting case-management conference for 2/18/2021 at 11:00 AM. Given the parties' agreements on production and their request for a further case-management conference on February 18, 2021 (with an updated case-management statement due on February 11, 2021), the court continues the November 12, 2020 case-management conference to February 18, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 11/11/2020) (Entered: 11/11/2020)
2020-12-2822CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons gran ted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar