Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSPLESTOSER V. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al.
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00731
Date Filed2020-03-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffKATHRYN SPLESTOSER
Case DescriptionKathryn Spletstoser submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Air Force for records concerning the agency's sexual assault investigation of General John Hyten. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency Spletstoser filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Defendant2255
DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
2255
DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-141COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Fee Status: $400 receipt number ADCDC-6921045) filed by Kathryn Spletstoser. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons (DoD), # 3 Summons (DoD General Counsel), # 4 Summons (Air Force), # 5 Summons (Air Force General Counsel), # 6 Summons (Attorney General), # 7 Summons (U.S. Attorney))(Gebhardt, Daniel) (Entered: 03/14/2020)
2020-03-162MOTION to SEAL Plaintiff's Address by Kathryn Spletstoser (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Gebhardt, Daniel) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-16Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-163SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-164ORDER granting 2 Motion to Suppress. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4-16-2020. (lcckk3) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-175SEALED DOCUMENT filed by KATHRYN SPLESTOSER re 4 Order on Motion to Suppress (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Gebhardt, Daniel) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-206ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/20/20. (DM) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar