Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Legal Aid Society v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv02283
Date Filed2020-03-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lewis J. Liman
PlaintiffThe Legal Aid Society
Case DescriptionOn behalf of the Legal Aid Society, the law firm of Winston & Strawn submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning a proposed rule requiring an immigration verification to obtain housing assistance. Winston & Strawn also requested expedited processing. HUD acknowledged receipt of the request and granted Winston & Strawn's request for expedited processing. HUD provided an interim response to part of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency the Legal Aid Society filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [6]
Opinion/Order [11]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-131COMPLAINT against United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19110031)Document filed by The Legal Aid Society. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Assignment of Rights to Legal Aid, # 2 Exhibit B - HUD's Proposed Rule, # 3 Exhibit C - The FOIA Request, # 4 Exhibit D - HUD's Acknowledgment Letter, # 5 Exhibit E - Emails between Winston & Strawn & HUD).(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-132CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-133RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Legal Aid Society..(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-134REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Legal Aid Society..(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-16CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-16Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-16Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-165ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Housing and Urban Development..(pc) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-166ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all counsel appear for a telephonic status conference on March 24, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel are directed to call (888)251-2909 and use access code 2123101. Counsel for Plaintiff is ordered to notify Defendant of this order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/16/2020) (va) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-16Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 3/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (va) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-167NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey J. Amato on behalf of The Legal Aid Society..(Amato, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-168NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kerry Donovan on behalf of The Legal Aid Society..(Donovan, Kerry) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-239NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kirti Vaidya Reddy on behalf of United States Department of Housing and Urban Development..(Reddy, Kirti) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-2410NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay Wexler on behalf of The Legal Aid Society..(Wexler, Jay) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-2411ORDER: As discussed at the teleconference this morning: IT IS HEREBY NOTED that service is deemed accepted by Defendant. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall run from this date. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED for all counsel to appear for a telephonic status conference on April 8, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel are directed to call (888) 251-2909 and use access code 2123101. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/24/2020) (va) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar