Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00741
Date Filed2020-03-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed reporter Jason Leopold submitted FOIA requests to components of the Department of Justice for records provided to Attorney General William Barr pertaining to impeachment and the investigation of Russian interference in the 2016 presidential campaign, including opening criminal investigations into the basis of the impeachment charges against President Trump and the possibility of pardoning Michael Flynn. Leopold also asked for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-161COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6922750) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-162NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-163LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-17Case assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmc) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-174SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-04-245AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-05-086ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Pezzi, Stephen) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-05-13MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by May 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/13/20. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/27/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-277Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 7 joint status report, the parties are ORDERED to file a further status report by June 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/28/20. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/25/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-178RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/7/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-179RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/7/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-1710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/8/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/7/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-2511Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 joint status report, the parties are ORDERED to file a further status report by August 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/29/20. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/7/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-08-0712Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Pezzi, Stephen) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
2020-08-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 joint status report, the parties are ORDERED to file a further status report by October 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/8/20. (lccrc1) (Entered: 08/08/2020)
2020-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/7/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-10-0713Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Pezzi, Stephen) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-08MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before December 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/8/2020. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-12-0714Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Pezzi, Stephen) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-09MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 14 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further joint status report on February 5, 2021, and then every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/9/2020. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar