Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES v. CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00785
Date Filed2020-03-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffPUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES
Case DescriptionPublic Advocates of the United States submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Disease Control for records concerning the production of the 2014 video series Start Talking. Stop HIV. PAUS also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. CDC acknowledged receipt of the request. CDC subsequently denied PAUS's requests for expedited processing and a fee waiver. CDC then told PAUS that its request was too broad and would be closed. CDC subsequently agreed to search for records but asked PAUS to pay $5,958 in estimated fees. PAUS filed an administrative appeal challenging the fee estimate and asking for a fee waiver instead. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PAUS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-201COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6942137) filed by PUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons to AG, # 11 Summons to USA, # 12 Summons to CDC)(Olson, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-03-202LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES (Olson, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-03-23Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zsb) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-233SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-04-284NOTICE of Appearance by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-05-015Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Sian) Modified event on 5/4/2020 (ztd). (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-05-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 5 unopposed motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the government shall file its answer or other response by not later than June 5, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/1/2020. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-05-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/5/2020. (tb) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-06-056ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION.(Jones, Sian) (Entered: 06/05/2020)
2020-06-087ORDER directing parties to confer and to submit a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions or a proposed processing and production schedule by not later than July 8, 2020. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/8/2020. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 7/8/2020. (tb) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar