Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case Titlede Chavez v. Executive Office for Immigration Review
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2020cv00455
Date Filed2020-03-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas S. Zilly
PlaintiffJaquelyn Andrade de Chavez
Case DescriptionJaquelyn Andrade de Chavez submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office of Immigration Review concerning the records related to her EOIR proceedings. She also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and ultimately produced an audio recording of her proceedings. After hearing nothing further from the agency, she filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantExecutive Office for Immigration Review an agency of the United States
DefendantDefendant/Appellee
Executive Office for Immigration Review An Agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [2]
Opinion/Order [6]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-261MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Jaquelyn Andrade de Chavez. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Theriot-Orr, Devin) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
2020-03-27Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SG) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-03-30REFERRING 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to: Judge Brian A Tsuchida. (KB) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-04-012ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(MW) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-013COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Executive Office for Immigration Review (Summons(es) as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Jaquelyn Andrade de Chavez.(MW) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-014Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Executive Office for Immigration Review (MW) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-015AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Executive Office for Immigration Review on 4/1/2020, filed by Plaintiff Jaquelyn Andrade de Chavez. (Theriot-Orr, Devin) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-136ORDER: To facilitate entry of an appropriate scheduling order in this matter, and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and Local Civil Rule 16, counsel are directed to confer and to file a JOINT STATUS REPORT by 7/31/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) (Entered: 04/13/2020)
2020-04-177NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant Executive Office for Immigration Review. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-278NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Jaquelyn Andrade de Chavez (Theriot-Orr, Devin) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar