Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKnight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University v. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv02761
Date Filed2020-04-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Analisa Torres
PlaintiffKnight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University
Case DescriptionThe Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention for records concerning the agency's policy on when CDC employees may communicate directly with the press and the public. The Knight First Amendment Institute also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the Institute's request for expedited processing. The agency also told the Institute that its request was too broad. The Institute agreed to narrow the time frame of its request and limit it to a list of potential custodians. After hearing further from the agency, the Knight First Amendment Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCenters for Disease Control and Prevention
DefendantU.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [10]
Opinion/Order [21]
Opinion/Order [24]
Opinion/Order [27]
Opinion/Order [54]
Opinion/Order [57]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-021COMPLAINT against Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19315430)Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C).(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-022RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-023CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-024REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-025REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-026NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Abraham Abdo on behalf of Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Abdo, Alexander) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-03CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-04-03Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-04-03Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-04-037ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services..(pc) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-04-038ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Centers for Disease Control and Prevention..(pc) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-04-069ORDER: It is ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference scheduled for June 4, 2020, at 1:20 p.m. shall proceed telephonically. The parties are each directed to call either (888) 398-2342 or (215) 861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 01:20 PM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/6/2020) (cf) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-0610ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/6/2020) (cf) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-0611ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 01:20 PM before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/6/2020) (cf) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-2212SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention served on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 04/22/2020)
2020-04-2213SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 04/22/2020)
2020-04-2214SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 04/22/2020)
2020-04-2215SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 04/22/2020)
2020-04-2716NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Edward Krause on behalf of Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services..(Krause, Andrew) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-05-0817AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services.Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. Related document: 1 Complaint,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C).(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-05-1318MOTION for Stephanie Krent to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19823123. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order).(Krent, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-13>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 18 MOTION for Stephanie Krent to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19823123. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ad) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-1519ORDER granting 18 Motion for Stephanie Krent to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (AH) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-05-2220ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services..(Krause, Andrew) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-05-2621ORDER: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for June 4, 2020, at 1:20 p.m. is RESCHEDULED to June 4, 2020, at 11:20 a.m. The conference shall proceed telephonically. The parties are each directed to call either (888) 398-2342 or (215) 861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 11:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres., Telephone Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 11:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/26/2020) (ama) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-2622ORDER: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for June 4, 2020, at 11:20 a.m. is RESCHEDULED to June 4, 2020, at 1:20 p.m.-the time at which it was originally set to take place. Counsel should disregard the order at ECF No. 21. The conference shall proceed telephonically. The parties are each directed to call either (888) 398-2342 or (215) 861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 01:20 PM before Judge Analisa Torres. Telephone Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 01:20 PM before Judge Analisa Torres). (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/26/2020) (rjm) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-2823JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stephanie Krent and Andrew Krause dated 05/28/2020 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A).(Krent, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-06-04Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/4/2020. (AH) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
2020-06-0424ORDER: By June 9, 2020, Defendants shall complete processing of records responsive to Plaintiffs "prioritized records" request under the Freedom of Info1mation Act for (i) the CDC'scurrently operative employee communications or speech policies and (ii) any policies or guidelines concerning the coordination of statements and/or public appearances with the Office of Vice President Mike Pence or the White House Coronavirns Task Force, other than any records in these categories for which consultation, referral, or coordination is required pursuant to 45 C.F.R. § 5.25(b ), and will produce responsive, non-exempt records that it has processed. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 6/4/2020) (cf) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
2020-06-0925LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew E. Krause dated June 9, 2020 re: deadline for processing certain records. Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services..(Krause, Andrew) (Entered: 06/09/2020)
2020-07-0626LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Andrew E. Krause dated July 6, 2020 re: deadline for processing certain records. Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services..(Krause, Andrew) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-1027ORDER re: 26 Letter, filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. On July 6, 2020, Defendants reported that they had completed production of all records they deemed responsive and non-exempt in response to Plaintiff's Freedom of Information Act request. ECF No. 26. It is ORDERED that by August 7, 2020, the parties shall file a joint letter indicating whether any disputes are outstanding, and stating whether any party intends to file any motions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/10/2020) (kv) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-2028JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Anna Diakun and Andrew E. Krause dated 07/20/2020 re: Parties' outstanding disputes and proposed summary judgment briefing schedule. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A).(Krent, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-2729ORDER: The Court having reviewed the parties' joint letter dated July 20, 2020, ECF No. 28, it is ORDERED that: 1. The parties' request to dispense with the requirement of additional pre-motion letters under Rule III(A) of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases is GRANTED; 2. By August 26, 2020, Defendants shall provide Plaintiff with a draft Vaughn index; 3. By September 4, 2020, Defendants shall file their motion for summary judgment; 4. By September 18, 2020, Plaintiff shall file its cross-motion for summary judgment; 5. By October 2, 2020, Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment and any reply in support of their own motion for summary judgment, in a single memorandum of law; 6. By October 16, 2020, Plaintiff shall file its reply, if any; 7. Each of the four memoranda of law filed by the parties may encompass 30 pages, but may not exceed that length. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 9/4/2020. Cross Motions due by 9/18/2020. Responses due by 10/2/2020 Replies due by 10/16/2020. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/27/2020) (kv) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-2930PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-07-2931CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, Attorney Natasha Waglow Teleanu for Centers for Disease Control and Prevention,Natasha Waglow Teleanu for U.S. Department of Health and Human Services added. Attorney Andrew Edward Krause terminated. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/29/2020) (kv) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-09-0432MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-0433MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-0434DECLARATION of Roger Andoh in Support re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A).(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-1435FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jennifer Pinsof to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21644166. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order).(Pinsof, Jennifer) Modified on 9/14/2020 (aea). (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-14>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 35 MOTION for Jennifer Pinsof to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21644166. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Affidavit is not notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-1536MOTION for Jennifer Pinsof to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (notarized), # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order).(Pinsof, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-16>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 36 MOTION for Jennifer Pinsof to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-1637ORDER granting 36 Motion for Jennifer Pinsof to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (ah) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-1838CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-1839MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 38 CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-1840DECLARATION of Jennifer Pinsof in Support re: 38 CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16).(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-10-0241REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment . and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-0242DECLARATION of Roger Andoh in Support re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-0243DECLARATION of Natasha W. Teleanu in Support re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A).(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-1644REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 38 CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-1645DECLARATION of Jennifer Pinsof in Support re: 38 CROSS MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3).(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-2646ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Anna Diakun dated 10/16/2020 re: request oral argument. ENDORSEMENT: DENIED. The Court has determined that oral argument will not be necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/26/2020) (va) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-12-1047LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 12/10/2020 re: Release of certain records. Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-1048LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Anna Diakun dated December 10, 2020 re: Government's Release of Certain Records. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1).(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2021-04-1349LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Anna Diakun dated April 13, 2021 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1).(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 04/13/2021)
2021-04-2050LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Natasha W. Teleanu dated April 20, 2021 re: response to Plaintiff's April 13, 2021 letter regarding supplemental authority. Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/20/2021)
2021-07-2151LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Anna Diakun dated July 21, 2021 re: Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1).(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 07/21/2021)
2021-09-0152MOTION for Jennifer Pinsof to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Pinsof, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-0153MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting 52 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Jennifer Pinsof terminated. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/1/2021) (va) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-1754ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is DENIED without prejudice and Plaintiff's cross-motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part without prejudice. Specifically, 1) The CDC shall conduct a new search for documents responsive to requests one and two, pursuant to this opinion. By October 8, 2021, the parties shall meet and confer and engage in a good faith effort to agree to search terms, initial custodians for the search, and a reasonable timeline for Defendants' production. The parties shall also confer on a search for items responsive to the Court's June 4 order, as discussed in § III.B.2. If the parties cannot reach agreement, they shall file a joint submission setting forth their respective positions within seven days of their meeting. 2) By September 24, 2021, Defendants shall release to Plaintiff un-redacted versions Documents 9, 10, 11, 27, and 28. Defendants may apply other exemptions, where warranted. 3) By October 1, 2021, Defendants shall produce Document 12 to Plaintiff with all segregable factual material un-redacted, pursuant to this opinion; 4) By October 8, 2021, Defendants shall submit Document 12 to the Court under seal for in camera review, along with an affidavit or revised Vaughn Index describing whether it, or any iteration of the document, was ever operative, pursuant to this opinion. After completing the productions described above, the parties may renew their motions for summary judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 32 and 38. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/17/2021) (kv) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-09-2055LETTER MOTION to Stay re: 54 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,, the Court's disclosure rulings to allow time to determine whether to appeal addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 9/20/2021. Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
2021-09-2156LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Anna Diakun dated September 21, 2021 re: 55 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: 54 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,, the Court's disclosure rulings to allow time to determine whether to appeal addressed to Judge Analisa . Document filed by Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University..(Diakun, Anna) (Entered: 09/21/2021)
2021-09-2257ORDER granting 55 Letter Motion to Stay re: 55 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: 54 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, the Court's disclosure rulings to allow time to determine whether to appeal addressed to Judge Analisa. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/22/2021) (kv) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-10-0858LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Natasha W. Teleanu dated October 8, 2021 re: submission of declaration of Michelle Bonds pursuant to the Court's September 17, 2021 Order (ECF No. 54). Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration of Michelle Bonds).(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 10/08/2021)
2021-10-0859***EX-PARTE*** LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Natasha W. Teleanu dated October 8, 2021 re: submission of Document 12 for in camera review. Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Document 12)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 54 .(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 10/08/2021)
2021-10-1460LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 10/14/2021. Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-1461ORDER granting 60 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 10/14/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar