Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMichigan Immigrant Rights Center et al v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictEastern District of Michigan
CityDetroit
Case Number2:2016cv14192
Date Filed2016-11-30
Date Closed2020-03-23
JudgeDistrict Judge Mark A. Goldsmith
PlaintiffMichigan Immigrant Rights Center
PlaintiffDr. Geoffrey Alan Boyce
PlaintiffDr. Elizabeth Oglesby
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Michigan
DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantCustomers and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [92]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-11-301COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5979051 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A (5/21/15 FOIA Request)) (Damren, Samuel) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-11-302EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint,, by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B (Cover email), # 2 Exhibit C (7/13/15 resubmission of FOIA request), # 3 Exhibit D (FOIA Receipt), # 4 Exhibit E (10/6/15 email), # 5 Exhibit F (10/14/15 Aukerman Leter), # 6 Exhibit G (10/21/15 (email), # 7 Exhibit H (11/19/15 Aukerman Letter)) (Damren, Samuel) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-11-303EXHIBIT re 1 Complaint,, by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I (1/12/16 Howard Letter), # 2 Exhibit J (2/29/16 Appeal Letter), # 3 Exhibit K (5/9/16 Closure Letter), # 4 Exhibit L (9/30/16 Suzuki Letter), # 5 Exhibit M (10/21/15 Email), # 6 Exhibit N (10/30/15 Email), # 7 Exhibit O (10/26/16 Aukerman Email), # 8 Exhibit P (2/26/16 Plaintiffs' Letter)) (Damren, Samuel) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-11-304ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Miriam J. Aukerman appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Aukerman, Miriam) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-11-305NOTICE of Appearance by Corey Q. Wheaton on behalf of Dr. Elizabeth Oglesby, Dr. Geoffrey Alan Boyce, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center. (Wheaton, Corey) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-11-30A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-11-306SUMMONS Issued for *Customers and Border Protection* (LGra) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-11-307SUMMONS Issued for *Department of Homeland Security* (LGra) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-12-158SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (LGra) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2016-12-309NOTICE of Appearance by Derri T. Thomas on behalf of Customers and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security. (Thomas, Derri) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2017-01-0310STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Answer 1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 2/6/2017, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-02-0611NOTICE of Appearance by Emily B. Nestler on behalf of All Defendants. (Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-0612ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-0913NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2017 09:30 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara, or file Rule 26(f) Plan. (WBar) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-21Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 3/24/2017 09:30 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara, or file Rule 26(f) Plan. (WBar) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-03-2014MOTION Motion to Deem Certain Allegations in the Complaint Admitted Under Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 8(B)(6) or, In The Alternative, to Take a Limited Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 30(B)(6) Deposition by All Plaintiffs. (Damren, Samuel) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-21TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 3/24/2017 is Cancelled. (WBar) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-2115Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re 14 MOTION Motion to Deem Certain Allegations in the Complaint Admitted Under Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 8(B)(6) or, In The Alternative, to Take a Limited Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 30(B)(6) Deposition (WBar) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-2316STIPULATION for Defendants to file First Amended Answer by All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Answer) (Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-24TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation for Leave to File Amended Answer. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-04-0317RESPONSE to 14 MOTION Motion to Deem Certain Allegations in the Complaint Admitted Under Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 8(B)(6) or, In The Alternative, to Take a Limited Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 30(B)(6) Deposition , or in the Alternative, Cross-Motion to Strke Certain Allegations in the Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-1018REPLY to Response re 14 MOTION Motion to Deem Certain Allegations in the Complaint Admitted Under Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 8(B)(6) or, In The Alternative, to Take a Limited Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 30(B)(6) Deposition filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 4-6-17 Correspondence from U.S. Customs and Border Protection) (Damren, Samuel) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-06-0819OPINION AND ORDER denying 14 Motion to Deem Certain Allegations in the Complaint Admitted. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-0820NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2017 10:00 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara, or file Rule 26(f) Plan. (WBar) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-07-1121DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Damren, Samuel) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
2017-07-12TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 7/14/17 is Cancelled re 20 Notice to Appear (WBar) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-07-2822AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A (5/21/15 FOIA Request), # 3 Exhibit B (5/21/15 Cover Email), # 4 Exhibit C (7/13/15 Resubmission of FOIA Request), # 5 Exhibit 7/13/15 Receipt of FOIA Request), # 6 Exhibit 10/6/15 Email Deny Expedited Processing), # 7 Exhibit F (10/14/15 Letter Appealing Denial), # 8 Exhibit G (10/21/15 Email re Fee Waiver), # 9 Exhibit 11/19/15 Letter Appealing Failure to Make Timely Determination), # 10 Exhibit I (1/12/16 Letter re Initial Response to FOIA Request), # 11 Exhibit J (2/29/16 Appeal Letter), # 12 Exhibit K (5/9/16 Administrative Closure), # 13 Exhibit L (9/30/16 Letter re Appeal of Expedited Processing), # 14 Exhibit M (10/21/15 Email), # 15 Exhibit N (10/30/15 Email), # 16 Exhibit 10/26/16 Email Seeking Clarification on Case Numbers), # 17 Exhibit P (2/26/16 Letter re Problems with FOIA Online System), # 18 Exhibit Q (5/3/17 2017 FOIA Request), # 19 Exhibit R (5/16/17 2017 FOIA Return Receipt)) (Damren, Samuel) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
2017-08-0423STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Scheduling and Discovery Plan; Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2017, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-1124ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Customers and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security. (Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-09-1825JOINT REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULE by All Plaintiffs (Wheaton, Corey) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
2017-09-25Set Deadline: Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2017 (WBar) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-10-2526JOINT REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULE by American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan, Dr. Elizabeth Oglesby, Dr. Geoffrey Alan Boyce, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center (Wheaton, Corey) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
2017-10-27Set Deadline: Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2017 (WBar) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
2017-11-2927Joint Status Report REPORT by All Plaintiffs (Wheaton, Corey) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
2017-12-14TEXT-ONLY ORDER Adopting 27 Joint Status Report; Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is due 2/14/2018, Plaintiffs' Response and Cross-Motion is due by 3/28/2018, Defendants' Reply due 5/9/2018, Plaintiffs' Reply due 6/6/2018, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2018-02-1428MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, Declaration of Robert Lewandowski, # 3 Exhibit A-1, # 4 Exhibit A-2, # 5 Exhibit A-3, # 6 Exhibit A-4, # 7 Exhibit A-5, # 8 Exhibit A-6, # 9 Exhibit A-7, # 10 Exhibit A-8) (Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-1529NOTICE OF HEARING on 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara (WBar) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-03-2030MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney and Substitution of Counsel for Emily B. Nestler by Customers and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security. (Nestler, Emily) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2331ORDER granting 30 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-2832MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A (Border Patrol Map), # 3 Exhibit B (2015 FOIA Request), # 4 Exhibit C (2/29/16 Dykema Letter), # 5 Exhibit D (2017 FOIA Request), # 6 Exhibit E (Category A Sample), # 7 Exhibit F 3/30/17 Aukerman/Nestler Email Exchange), # 8 Exhibit G (Category B Sample), # 9 Exhibit H 3/5/18 Aukerman Letter), # 10 Exhibit I (3/16/18 Aukerman/Nestler Email Exchange), # 11 Exhibit J (Bratlie Declaration), # 12 Exhibit K (Mass Declaration), # 13 Exhibit L (Cohn Declaration), # 14 Exhibit M (Sheley Declaration), # 15 Exhibit N (Wessler Declaration), # 16 Exhibit O (Robinson Declaration), # 17 Exhibit P (Morawetz Declaration), # 18 Exhibit Q (Ebadolahi Declaration), # 19 Exhibit R (Aukerman Declaration)) (Wheaton, Corey) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-2833AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING on 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara (WBar) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-05-0934RESPONSE to 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and REPLY in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Robert Lewandowski) (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-06-0435AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING on 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing RESET for 8/2/2018 10:15 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara (WBar) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-0536STIPULATED ORDER Granting Leave to file Reply in Excess of Page Limitation, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-0637RESPONSE to 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan, Dr. Elizabeth Oglesby, Dr. Geoffrey Alan Boyce, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center. (Wheaton, Corey) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-07-03Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge John Corbett O'Meara in Ann Arbor to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith in Detroit pursuant to Administrative Order 18-AO-023. (NAhm) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-0638NOTICE OF HEARING on 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2018 at 01:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-08-08Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Motion Hearing held on 8/8/2018 re 32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michigan Immigrant Rights Center, American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan, Dr. Elizabeth Oglesby, Dr. Geoffrey Alan Boyce. Disposition: Supplemental Briefs due 8/27/2018 . (Court Reporter: David Yarbrough) (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-10TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The parties shall file supplemental briefs not to exceed 10 pages, exclusive of attachments, and must be filed on or before 8/27/2018 . SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-1339TRANSCRIPT of Plaintiffs' Cross-motion for Partial Summary Judgment, et al held on 8/8/2018. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: David B. Yarbrough) (Number of Pages: 71) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 9/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2018. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Yarbrough, David) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-2740STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BREIFING( Supplemental briefs due by 9/7/2018 ) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-09-0741STIPULATED ORDER Resolving Cross-Motions for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF 28 & 32 ) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-0742ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 28 ) and Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 32 ) as Moot. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-1443[STRICKEN] STIPULATION of Both Parties to Extend Time by All Defendants (Healy, Christopher) Modified on 9/18/2018 (Sandusky, K). (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-1844ORDER Striking Stipulation (Dkt. 43). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-1945STIPULATED ORDER ON THE CATEGORIES C AND D PRODUCTION SCHEDULE. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-2846NOTICE by All Defendants - JOINT PRODUCTION SCHEDULE STATUS REPORT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Thorp, Galen) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-0447NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith . Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-16Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/16/2018 (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-1748ORDER for Additional Information Regarding Production. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-2349NOTICE by All Defendants re 48 Order , Filing of Declaration of Patrick A. Howard (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick A. Howard) (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-2950NOTICE of Appearance by Dante A. Stella on behalf of Dr. Elizabeth Oglesby, Dr. Geoffrey Alan Boyce, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center. (Stella, Dante) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-3051RESPONSE to Declaration of Patrick A. Howard Dated October 23, 2018 by All Plaintiffs. (Stella, Dante) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-2652ORDER SETTING PRODUCTION SCHEDULE ( Joint Statement due by 12/10/2018 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-12-1053Joint STATEMENT of Position as to Attorneys' Fees Briefing by Customers and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-2654MOTION to Stay Production Deadline Due to Lapse of Appropriations by Customers and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security. (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2019-01-1055Second MOTION to Stay Production Schedule by Customers and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security. (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-1756ORDER GRANTING IN PART GOVERNMENTS MOTIONS TO STAY (Dkts. 54 , 55 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-2457MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by Customers and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security. (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-2858MOTION to Withdraw 57 MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations in Light of Restoration of Appropriations, and Motion to Continue Production Schedule by Customers and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security. (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-04TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court grants the motion to withdraw the motion to stay (Dkt. 58 ). The Court sets a TELEPHONIC Status Conference on 2/13/2019 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith . Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-13Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/13/2019. (MacKay, K) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-02-1359ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Teleconference ( TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith ). Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-02-28Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/28/2019. (MacKay, K) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-2560ORDER Regarding Production of Categories C and D Documents. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EKar) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-04-0161NOTICE of Appearance by Nina Gavrilovic on behalf of Dr. Elizabeth Oglesby, Dr. Geoffrey Alan Boyce, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center. (Gavrilovic, Nina) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-0162Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees AND COSTS by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J) (Gavrilovic, Nina) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-2363STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to File Attorneys' Fees Opposition and Reply ( Response due by 5/8/2019 , Reply due by 5/22/2019 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-05-0864RESPONSE to 62 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees AND COSTS filed by All Defendants. (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 05/08/2019)
2019-05-2265REPLY to Response re 62 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees AND COSTS filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Gavrilovic, Nina) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-2366[STRICKEN] REPLY to Response re 62 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees AND COSTS Corrected Reply to Response re Joint Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Gavrilovic, Nina) Modified on 5/28/2019 (Sandusky, K). (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-2867ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT (Dkt. 66). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-2968REPLY to Response re 62 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees AND COSTS Corrected Reply to Response re Joint Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Gavrilovic, Nina) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-06-2669STIPULATED ORDER Resolving Redaction Challenges to Category C and D Productions for March, April and May 2019. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-09-0370NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S. Korobkin on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Korobkin, Daniel) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-10-1071NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith . Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. (BSau) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-11Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/11/2019. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (BSau) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-2972STIPULATED ORDER Resolving Redaction Challenges to Category C and D Productions for June, July, and August 2019. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-12-2373MOTION TO EXTEND Production Deadline Due to Unexpected Error by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick Howard) (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-2774NOTICE OF HEARING BY TELEPHONE on 73 MOTION TO EXTEND Production Deadline Due to Unexpected Error . Motion Hearing set for 12/30/2019 at 08:30 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith . The parties shall use the following call-in information: (877) 336-1274 and use access code: 9602327. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 12/27/2019)
2019-12-2875RESPONSE to 73 MOTION TO EXTEND Production Deadline Due to Unexpected Error filed by All Plaintiffs. (Aukerman, Miriam) (Entered: 12/28/2019)
2019-12-30Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 12/30/2019 re 73 MOTION TO EXTEND Production Deadline Due to Unexpected Error filed by Department of Homeland Security, Customers and Border Protection. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 12/30/2019)
2020-01-0276ORDER Granting in part Defendant's Motion to Extend Production Deadlines (Dkt. 73 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 01/02/2020)
2020-01-0877OPINION AND ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Motion for an Interim Award of Attorney Fees and Costs (Dkt. 62 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (BSau) (Entered: 01/08/2020)
2020-01-0978NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Cesilia Andrade on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Andrade, Monica) (Entered: 01/09/2020)
2020-01-1379Joint MOTION for Sanctions by All Plaintiffs. (Gavrilovic, Nina) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-3180RESPONSE to 79 Joint MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Defendants. (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-3181ERRATA Sheet re: 80 Response to Motion filed by Department of Homeland Security, Customers and Border Protection. by All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions) (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-02-0782STIPULATION AND ORDER for Page Limit Extension. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-02-0783REPLY to Response re 79 Joint MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gavrilovic, Nina) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-02-2884NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith . Attorney for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and then include the Court when all parties are available by calling 313/234-5240. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-03-05Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/5/2020. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-0685SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re Status Conference and Retention of Jurisdiction Over Sanctions Motion after Issuance of a Final Order filed by Customers and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security. (Healy, Christopher) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-2386FINAL STIPULATED ORDER Resolving Redaction Challenges to Category C and D Productions. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-2387ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar