Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMURTAGH v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00914
Date Filed2020-04-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJAMES MURTAGH
Case DescriptionJames Murtaugh submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Service's Indian Health Service field office in Aberdeen, South Dakota, for records about his time working at the Fort Yates Indian Hospital. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and the Aberdeen field office responded only with records originally supplied by Murtaugh. Murtaugh then filed an administrative appeal to the HHS Support Center in Rockville. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Murtaugh filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES Indian Health Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-061COMPLAINT (FOIA) against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6994313) filed by JAMES MURTAGH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Hartnett, F.) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-07Case assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmc) (Entered: 04/07/2020)
2020-04-072ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) Modified on 4/7/2020 (zmc). (Entered: 04/07/2020)
2020-04-073REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Defendant re 1 Complaint, filed by JAMES MURTAGH. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by JAMES MURTAGH. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Hartnett, F.) (Entered: 04/07/2020)
2020-04-084SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/08/2020)
2020-04-205RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 4/14/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/15/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/15/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/15/2020.) (Hartnett, F.) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-05-156ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-05-157ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before May 29, 2020. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/15/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-298Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-01MINUTE ORDER. The parties' time to file their initial Joint Status Report is extended to June 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/01/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-299Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-30MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by August 28, 2020, which advises whether any outstanding disputes remain and, if so, proposes a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/30/2020. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-06-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar