Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMontana Environmental Information Center v. United States Department of Energy
DistrictDistrict of Montana
CityHelena
Case Number6:2020cv00029
Date Filed2020-04-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Sam E Haddon
PlaintiffMontana Environmental Information Center
Case DescriptionThe Montana Environmental Information Center submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy for records concerning carbon capture sequestration related issues at Colstrip, Montana, coal-fired power plant. MEIC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency asked MEIC to clarify the scope of its request. MEIC did so. The agency provided some records but after hearing nothing further from the agency, MEIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Energy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [13]
Opinion/Order [16]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-091COMPLAINT against United States Department of Energy, filed by Montana Environmental Information Center. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG) (Entered: 04/09/2020)
2020-04-09Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2467177 (HEG) (Entered: 04/09/2020)
2020-04-092Summons Issued as to United States Department of Energy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Copies emailed to counsel for service. (Attachments: # 1 William Barr Summons, # 2 Kurt Alme Summons) (HEG) (Entered: 04/09/2020)
2020-04-233AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Civil Process Clerk on 4/13/20, filed by Montana Environmental Information Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Wilson, David) (Entered: 04/23/2020)
2020-05-054AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on United States Department of Energy on 4/21/20, filed by Montana Environmental Information Center. (Wilson, David) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-055AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on United States Attorney General on 4/17/20, filed by Montana Environmental Information Center. (Wilson, David) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-086AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on US Attorney for the District of Montana on May 6, 2020, filed by Montana Environmental Information Center. (Wilson, David) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-05-127ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Department of Energy. (Smith, Mark) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-128Order Setting: Joint Proposed Discovery due by 6/19/2020. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/19/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/12/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-06-199JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by United States Department of Energy. (Spraker, Chad) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-1910STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by United States Department of Energy. (Spraker, Chad) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-1911PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by United States Department of Energy. (Spraker, Chad) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-1912PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Montana Environmental Information Center. (Wilson, David) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-2213ORDERED:This case will be dismissed on June 26, 2020, unless necessary and appropriate revisions of the preliminary pretrial statements addressing the deficiencies outlined above are filed and served on or before June 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 6/22/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-2414AMENDED Preliminary Pretrial Statement by Montana Environmental Information Center. Amendment to 12 Preliminary Pretrial Statement AMENDED PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT . (Wilson, David) Modified on 6/24/2020 to clarify document description (HEG). (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-2515AMENDED DOCUMENT by United States Department of Energy. Amendment to 11 Preliminary Pretrial Statement . (Spraker, Chad) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-07-0616ORDERED: Defendant shall produce "rolling monthly productions"' of all non-exempt records responsive to Plaintiffs Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA") request on or before: 10/2/2020. Objections to any records withheld from production shall be filed on or before: 10/30/2020. Responses to objections to any records withheld from production shall be filed on or before:11/20/2020. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/6/2020. (HEG) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-0717SUPPLEMENT re 15 Amended Document Preliminary Pretrial Statement by United States Department of Energy. (Spraker, Chad) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar