Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWindom v. Drug Enforcement Administration et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv02431
Date Filed2020-04-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffCameron Windom
Case DescriptionCameron Windom submitted FOIA requests to the Drug Enforcement Administration and the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, and Firearms for records concerning the Guns and Fists Newsletter. After hearing nothing further from the agency Windom filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDrug Enforcement Administration
DefendantBureau of Alcohol, Tobacco & Firearms
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [8]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-081COMPLAINT against Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco & Firearms, Drug Enforcement Administration. Filed byCameron Windom. Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2020) (Entered: 04/10/2020)
2020-04-082MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cameron Windom. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2020) (Entered: 04/10/2020)
2020-04-083Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2020 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2020) (Entered: 04/10/2020)
2020-04-284CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 5/12/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-05-195CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 6/2/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-06-086CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cameron Windom. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-07-067CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cameron Windom re 1 Complaint, notice of waiver of summons and subpoena production of documents. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-078ORDER granting 2 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why complaint should not be dismissed. Response due by August 4, 2020. Case management conference continued to October 30, 3030. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on July 7, 2020. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2020) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-08Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 8/4/2020. Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020)See Order 8 (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-289CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed. All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619260804?pwd=RE5qWDhGOTdWWTZUOFlOKzhNc3pjZz09 Meeting ID: 161 926 0804 Password: 050855 Dial by your location +1 929 205 6099 US (New York) +1 253 215 8782 US +1 301 715 8592 US +1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago) +1 346 248 7799 US (Houston) +1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose) Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjo For important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2020 02:00 PM in Sa n Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar