Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCohodes v United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2020cv02469
Date Filed2020-04-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore
PlaintiffMarc Cohodes an individual
Case DescriptionMarc Cohodes submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications to DOJ, particularly the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York, from Sen. Johnny Isakson or his staff, concerning Cohodes, MiMeds, or Parker Petit. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The FBI provided some previously disclosed records in response to one of his requests. Cohodes filed administrative appeals after the agency failed to respond. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Cohodes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantExecutive Office for United States Attorneys
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Marc Cohodes. (No Process) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shapiro, David) (Filed on 4/13/2020) ($400 filing fee receipt #0971-14366344)Modified on 4/14/2020 (haS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/14/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/13/2020)
2020-04-142Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/28/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-143Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-284CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marc Cohodes.. (Norton, William) (Filed on 4/28/2020) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar