Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMAURIZI v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00966
Date Filed2020-04-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffSTEFANIA MAURIZI
Case DescriptionStefania Maurizi, an Italian journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning Julian Assange. She also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of her request and denied her request for expedited processing and told her that her request qualified for unusual circumstances. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Maurizi filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Choice of format, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-131COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7017246) filed by Stefania Maurizi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Smith, Alia) (Entered: 04/13/2020)
2020-04-142ERRATA by Stefania Maurizi 1 Complaint, filed by Stefania Maurizi. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected complaint signature page, # 2 Corrected civil cover sheet)(Smith, Alia) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-15Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-04-153SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-04-164STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/16/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/15/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/15/2020. (Smith, Alia) (Entered: 04/23/2020)
2020-04-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/20/2020. (Smith, Alia) (Entered: 04/23/2020)
2020-04-307RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/15/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/15/2020. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-05-158NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-05-159ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-05-19MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than June 2, 2020. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/19/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Joint Scheduling Order due by 6/2/2020 (mac) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-06-0210Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-02MINUTE ORDER. In view of 10 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than July 2, 2020, informing the Court of the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request and proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file a proposed order with each joint status report. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/2/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/2/2020. (mac) (Entered: 06/03/2020)
2020-07-0211Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-30MINUTE ORDER. In view of 11 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with recommendations for further proceedings by no later than August 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/30/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-07-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/6/2020 (mac) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-07-3112NOTICE of Appearance by Kristel Tupja on behalf of STEFANIA MAURIZI (Tupja, Kristel) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-08-0613Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Plaintiff's Version), # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Defendant's Version))(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2020)
2020-09-02MINUTE ORDER. In view of 13 joint status report, in which the parties note their disagreements concerning document production deadlines, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant United States Department of State produce, claim subject to a FOIA exemption, or claim non-responsive, the remaining 318 potentially responsive unclassified documents within 45 days of this Court's Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by no later than September 25, 2020, informing the Court of the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request and proposing a schedule for the identification of the anticipated number of potentially responsive unclassified retired records and the anticipated date(s) for release of the unclassified retired records responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/2/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/25/2020 (mac) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-2414Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-10-06MINUTE ORDER. In view of 14 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than October 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/6/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/06/2020)
2020-10-07Set/Reset Deadlines: JointStatus Report due by 10/26/2020. (mac) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-2615Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Plaintiff's version), # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Defendant's version))(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-27MINUTE ORDER. In view of 15 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than December 1, 2020 with a recommendation for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/27/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/1/2020. (mac) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-12-0116Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-03MINUTE ORDER. In view of 16 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than January 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/3/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2021 (mac) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2021-01-0717Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-08MINUTE ORDER. In view of 17 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than February 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/8/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-01-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/8/2021 (mac) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-02-0418Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-04MINUTE ORDER. In view of 18 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by March 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/4/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/8/2021 (mac) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-03-0819Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order - Plaintiff's version, # 2 Text of Proposed Order - Defendant's version)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-0920WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO 22 NOTICE FILED ON 03/17/2021......MOTION for Order Setting Production Rate and Schedule by STEFANIA MAURIZI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Alia) Modified on 3/17/2021 (zjf). (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-10MINUTE ORDER. In view of 19 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than April 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/10/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2021. (mac) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-1521ERRATA by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 18 Status Report filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, 19 Status Report filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-15MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant the U.S. Department of State shall file a response to 20 motion for order setting production rate and schedule by no later than March 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/15/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-15Set/Reset Deadlines: U.S. Department Of State Response due by 3/23/2021 (mac) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-1722NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by STEFANIA MAURIZI re 20 MOTION for Order Setting Production Rate and Schedule (Smith, Alia) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-04-0723Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 04/07/2021)
2021-04-07MINUTE ORDER. In view of 23 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than May 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/7/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 04/07/2021)
2021-05-1124Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 05/11/2021)
2021-05-11MINUTE ORDER. In view of 24 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than June 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/11/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 05/11/2021)
2021-05-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2021. (mac) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
2021-06-1125Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
2021-06-11MINUTE ORDER. In view of 25 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than July 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/11/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
2021-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2021 (mac) (Entered: 06/12/2021)
2021-07-0626NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/06/2021)
2021-07-1227Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/12/2021)
2021-07-13MINUTE ORDER. In view of 27 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than August 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/13/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 07/13/2021)
2021-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/11/2021. (mac) (Entered: 07/13/2021)
2021-07-1928NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Russell on behalf of STEFANIA MAURIZI (Russell, Lauren) (Entered: 07/19/2021)
2021-07-1929NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STEFANIA MAURIZI. Attorney Kristel Tupja terminated. (Tupja, Kristel) (Entered: 07/19/2021)
2021-08-1030Joint STATUS REPORT by STEFANIA MAURIZI. (Russell, Lauren) (Entered: 08/10/2021)
2021-08-13MINUTE ORDER. In view of 30 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than September 13, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/13/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2021 (mac) (Entered: 08/15/2021)
2021-09-1331Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-15MINUTE ORDER. In view of 31 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than October 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/15/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/11/2021 (mac) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar