Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRapoport Weisberg & Sims, P.C. v. U.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2020cv02299
Date Filed2020-04-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer
PlaintiffRapoport Weisberg & Sims, P.C.
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Rappaport Weisberg & Sims submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board for records concerning the agency's 2018 investigation into an explosion at the Superior Refining Company in Superior, Wisconsin. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). RWS filed an administrative appeal of the agency denial. The agency's denial was upheld on appeal. RWS then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Litigation - In camera review

DefendantU.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-141COMPLAINT filed by Rapoport Weisberg & Sims, P.C.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16930030. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Sims, Matthew) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-142CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sims, Matthew) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-143ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rapoport Weisberg & Sims, P.C. by Matthew S Sims (Sims, Matthew) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-144ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rapoport Weisberg & Sims, P.C. by David E. Rapoport (Rapoport, David) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-14CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, ) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-14SUMMONS Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (ng, ) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-165MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 6/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-247ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-276DESIGNATION of Virginia Ovitz Hancock as U.S. Attorney for Defendant U.S. Chemical Safety and Hazard Investigation Board (Hancock, Virginia) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-298NOTICE by Rapoport Weisberg & Sims, P.C. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Sims, Matthew) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar