Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00975
Date Filed2020-04-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning communications between agency employees and outside entities or organizations (excluding the Justice Department) regarding supplemental prevailing wage determinations issued by DOL's National Prevailing Wage Center in 2013. Public Citizen also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and suggested that Public Citizen narrow the scope of its request to allow for more expeditious processing. Public Citizens declined to narrow its request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-141COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7019114) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to United States Attorney, # 3 Summons to Attorney General, # 4 Summons to U.S. Department of Labor)(Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-143NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Pulver on behalf of PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-14Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-144SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-205RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/20/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/20/2020. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-04-206RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/20/2020. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-04-207RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 4/20/2020 (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-05-018NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-05-209ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
2020-05-20MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 7/10/2020. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/20/20. (DJS) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
2020-05-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/10/2020. tb) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar