Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHill et al v. Homeland Security et al
DistrictWestern District of Louisiana
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2020cv00463
Date Filed2020-04-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dee D Drell
PlaintiffKenneth Hill
PlaintiffLindsey Rogers Alwell
PlaintiffWylie Barham
PlaintiffVerna Bertrand
PlaintiffKimberly Fannin
PlaintiffMarli Hudnall
PlaintiffTheresa Mitchell
PlaintiffCharlene Paul
PlaintiffMylinda Riddle
PlaintiffMemory Shriner Sweat
PlaintiffSommer Peeples
PlaintiffHansen Stringer
Case DescriptionKenneth Hill and a number of other individuals submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning all contracts with GEO for the operation of a facility for U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement in Jena, Louisiana. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hill and the others filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU S Dept of Homeland Security
DefendantU S Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-141COMPLAINT against U S Dept of Homeland Security and U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4235111) filed by Wylie Barham, Lindsey Rogers Alwell, Verna Bertrand, Kenneth Hill, Kimberly Fannin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil cover sheet, # 3 Proposed summons/writ, # 4 Proposed summons/writ, # 5 Proposed summons/writ, # 6 Proposed summons/writ, # 7 Proposed summons/writ, # 8 Proposed summons/writ, # 9 Proposed summons/writ, # 10 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney James F Willeford added to party Lindsey Rogers Alwell(pty:pla), Attorney James F Willeford added to party Wylie Barham(pty:pla), Attorney James F Willeford added to party Verna Bertrand(pty:pla), Attorney James F Willeford added to party Kimberly Fannin(pty:pla), Attorney James F Willeford added to party Kenneth Hill(pty:pla))(aty,Willeford, James) Modified on 4/15/2020 (Dauterive, C). (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-14DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 5:20-cv-0463 from Shreveport Division to Alexandria Division. New Case Number 1:20-cv-0463. Wrong division selected at case opening. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-04-14CASE Assigned to Judge Dee D Drell and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-04-152SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General, U S Dept of Homeland Security, U S Immigration & Customs Enforcement. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-04-163ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/16/2020. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-164CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No 1 for cases assigned to Judge Dee D Drell sent to counsel of record. (Plan of Work - Compliance Deadline set for 6/13/2020.)(crt,Roaix, G) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar