Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLAFAYETTE MEDIA GROUP, LLC et al v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00984
Date Filed2020-04-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffLAFAYETTE MEDIA GROUP, LLC
doing business as TASK & PURPOSE
PlaintiffPAUL SZOLDRA
Case DescriptionThe Lafayette Media Group, a veterans-focused digital media company, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Navy for records concerning emails sent to Capt. Brett Crozier between March 25 and April 2, 2020. Several days later, Lafayette Media Group clarified the scope of its request. Lafayette Media Group also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Lafayette Media Group filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-151COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7023914) filed by LAFAYETTE MEDIA GROUP, LLC, PAUL SZOLDRA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons USAG, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons DoD)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-04-15Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-04-152SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-05-183MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by LAFAYETTE MEDIA GROUP, LLC, PAUL SZOLDRA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - redlined FAC, # 3 Exhibit B - clean FAC, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/21/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USAG receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/27/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/27/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Plaintiffs' 3 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, ECF No. 3-3, is DEEMED FILED. LCvR 7(i). Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 19, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-196AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE filed by LAFAYETTE MEDIA GROUP, LLC, PAUL SZOLDRA.(eg) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-06-027NOTICE of Service of First Amended Complaint by LAFAYETTE MEDIA GROUP, LLC, PAUL SZOLDRA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Plaintiff's 7 Notice of Service of First Amended Complaint, which the Court construes as a Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its Answer to Plaintiff's 6 Amended Complaint by June 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 4, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
2020-06-04Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to amended complaint due by 6/16/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-158NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Lynch on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-06-169ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-18MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. According to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report by July 9, 2020. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiff's request and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiff's request can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 18, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-07-0910Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by August 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 13, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-08-0711Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
2020-08-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by September 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 8, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 08/08/2020)
2020-08-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/8/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-09-0812Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by October 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 10, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/8/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-10-0813Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by November 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 9, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/9/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-11-0914Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-11-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by December 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 14, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 11/14/2020)
2020-11-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/9/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-12-0915Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by January 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 14, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/11/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2021-01-1116Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
2021-01-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by February 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 14, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/10/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-02-1017Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 02/10/2021)
2021-02-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by March 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 15, 2021. (lccjn2) (Entered: 02/15/2021)
2021-02-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/12/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-03-1218Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-1919Joint STATUS REPORT Proposing Another Joint Status Report by April 16, 2021 by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by April 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 20, 2021. (Entered: 03/20/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar