Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00997
Date Filed2020-04-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning email communications and reports pertaining to the Pilot Study Contract. Cause of Action Institute also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency subsequently told Cause of Action Institute that its Office of Acquisition and Logistics had conducted a search and found no responsive records, but that the request had been transferred to the Veterans Health Administration for a final response. VHA acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7029244) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons Dep't of Veterans Affairs, # 9 Summons U.S. Att'y Gen., # 10 Summons U.S.A.O. Civil Process Clerk)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-16Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-174STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 17, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-215RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/20/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/20/2020. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-04-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 4/20/2020 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-04-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/17/2020. (Mulvey, Ryan) Modified date of service on 4/28/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-05-208NOTICE of Appearance by William Chang on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Chang, William) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
2020-05-209ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS.(Chang, William) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar