Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHUMAN RIGHTS WATCH v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01001
Date Filed2020-04-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffHUMAN RIGHTS WATCH
Case DescriptionHuman Rights Watch submitted FOIA requests in 2017 and 2018 to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning 700 Eritrean nationals subject to removal that were mentioned in a September 13, 2017 press release. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, HRW filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further, HRW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Defendant2255
DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
US Dept of Homeland Security
Office of the General Counsel
Washington, DC 20528
2255
IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
500 12th Street SW
Washington, DC 20536
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-161COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7030548) filed by HUMAN RIGHTS WATCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Summons ICE, # 9 Summons DHS)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-17Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-172SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-173STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 17, 2020. (lccjn1) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-05-054RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 4/24/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certified Mail)(London, Ronald) Modified on 5/5/2020 to correct serve date (eg). (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 4/27/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certified Mail)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar