Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleArledge v. Executive Office Of The United States Attorneys
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2020cv00931
Date Filed2020-04-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge A. Joe Fish
PlaintiffRichard A Arledge
Case DescriptionRichard Arledge, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys for records concerning a subpoena issued to Wachovia Bank date 2/13/2008 in the case titled U.S. District Court of Texas v. Cecil Coleman. The agency did not respond to Arledge's request. Arledge then submitted a FOIA request to the Criminal Division of the Justice Department for records concerning a case brought by the IRS. The Criminal Division referred the request to the IRS and closed it administratively. Arledge sent an identical request to EOUSA. After hearing nothing pertaining to that request, Arledge requested mediation. After hearing noting further from the agency, Arledge filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantExecutive Office Of The United States Attorneys
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-161COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS filed by Richard A. Arledge. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10772187) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 Exhibit(s) D, # 5 Exhibit(s) E) (Lurich, Ryan) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-162CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Richard A. Arledge. (Lurich, Ryan) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-163New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-164Summons issued as to Executive Office Of The United States Attorneys, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (hml) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-05-215Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Executive Office Of The United States Attorneys Attorney Clayton Ray Mahaffey-DOJ added to party Executive Office Of The United States Attorneys(pty:dft) (Mahaffey-DOJ, Clayton) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-216ELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendant's unopposed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead (docket entry 5) is GRANTED. The defendant shall electronically file its answer or otherwise plead no later than June 19, 2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/21/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar