Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJenkins v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictDistrict of Vermont
CityBurlington
Case Number2:2020cv00059
Date Filed2020-04-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William K. Sessions III
PlaintiffJanet Jenkins
Case DescriptionJanet Jenkins submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records produced in discovery in the case United States v. Timothy Miller. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Jenkins that it was put in the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Jenkins filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-161COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice filed by Janet Jenkins.Summonses issued. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(law) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-05-152SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. United States Department of Justice served on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Langrock, Frank) Text clarified on 5/15/2020 (law). (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-05-153NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: 2 Summons Returned Executed. Docket text has been corrected to read United States Department of Justice served on 5/4/2020, answer due 7/6/2020 . (law) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-05-184AMENDED COMPLAINT against Janet Jenkins filed by Janet Jenkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(jam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2020: # 3 Exhibit 3) (law). (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-185NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: 4 Amended Complaint filed by Janet Jenkins. Exhibit 3 was omitted at the time of filing. The exhibit is now attached to 4 and this entry. (law) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar