Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01010
Date Filed2020-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY a Wisconsin non-profit organization
Case DescriptionCenter for Media and Democracy submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning Form 990s submitted by 18 non-profit organizations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing from the agency, CMD filed an administrative appeal. After still hearing nothing further from the agency, CMD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DefendantUNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-171COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7034945) filed by CENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY. (DeThomas, Courtney) Modified event/text on 4/20/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-20Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-04-203SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-04-304RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/29/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/29/2020. (DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar