Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLora v. JFK International Airport U.S. Customs and Border Protections
DistrictMiddle District of Pennsylvania
CityScranton
Case Number3:2020cv00628
Date Filed2020-04-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson
PlaintiffRafael Lora
Case DescriptionRafael Lora, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning a package sent by CBP to Lora. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Lora filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantJFK International Airport U.S. Customs and Border Protections Office of Chief Cousenl or Designee
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-021REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Rafael Lora. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/16/2020.] (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-022COMPLAINT against JFK International Airport U.S. Customs and Border Protections. Document filed by Rafael Lora. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/16/2020.] (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-023PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Rafael Lora. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/16/2020.] (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-024MOTION re: to Compel response to "Freedom of Information Act" Request to the legal department of the John F. Kennedy International Airport, office of Chief Counsel and Border Patrol to properly respond to his request for documents pertaining to his Criminal case, No. 3:16-cr-91. Document filed by Rafael Lora. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/16/2020.] (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-07NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/16/2020.] (Entered: 04/07/2020)
2020-04-085TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees, and whether his "Motion to Compel Response to 'Freedom of Information Act' Request" should be granted, are determinations to be made by the transferee court. (ECF 1, 4.) A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/8/2020) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/16/2020.] (Entered: 04/08/2020)
2020-04-166Case transferred electronically in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02799 containing electronic documents. (ao) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-167PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form) (ao) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-168STANDING PRACTICE ORDER sent to Pltf. (ao) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-209THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by LP on 04/20/2020. (Attachments: # 1 IFP (mandamus action))(lp) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar