Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFOSTER v. U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01047
Date Filed2020-04-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffDARREN FOSTER
Case DescriptionDarren Foster, a documentary filmmaker, submitted two FOIA requests to the Drug Enforcement Administration for records concerning the investigation of a pill mill in Florida. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and denied them under Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Foster filed administrative appeals of both denials. Foster also submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office of U.S. Attorneys for records about the prosecution of the pill mill investigation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request under Exemption 7(C). Foster filed an administrative appeal of that decision as well. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Foster filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7044033) filed by DARREN FOSTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-J, # 3 Exhibit K-O, # 4 Exhibit P-Q, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-04-212NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of DARREN FOSTER (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-04-22Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)
2020-04-223SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)
2020-05-264Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Truong, John) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-26MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' 4 Motion for Extension of Time and ORDERS that they shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by June 29, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/26/2020. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/29/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-06-185ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION served on 4/28/2020 (Topic, Matthew); Modified on 6/19/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/29/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/29/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-188RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/29/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/29/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-19NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 5 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with the correct return receipt card attached. (ztth) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-229RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION served on 4/22/2020. (Topic, Matthew); Modified text on 6/23/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-2910Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Truong, John) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-29MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 10 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendants shall Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by July 14, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/29/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/14/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-1411ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION.(Truong, John) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed scheduling order by July 29, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 07/15/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/29/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-2912Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Truong, John) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-07-30MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 12 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by August 12, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 07/30/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-07-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-08-1213Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by DARREN FOSTER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 1-10, # 4 Exhibit 11-20, # 5 Exhibit 21-27, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-1214Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Truong, John) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-13MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Unopposed 13 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Court ORDERS that the Amended Complaint is deemed filed and served. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/13/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-13MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 14 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by August 27, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/13/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/27/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/27/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-1315AMENDED COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION filed by DARREN FOSTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 10, # 2 Exhibits 11 - 20, # 3 Exhibits 21 - 27) (ztth) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-2616ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION.(Truong, John) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-08-2717Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Truong, John) (Entered: 08/27/2020)
2020-08-28MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 17 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by October 27, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/28/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/27/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-10-2718Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Truong, John) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-28MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 18 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by December 29, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/28/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/29/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-12-2819Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Status Report by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Truong, John) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2020-12-28MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 19 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file their next joint status report by January 19, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/28/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2020-12-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2021-01-1920Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Truong, John) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 20 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by March 19, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/19/2021. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/19/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-03-1921Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Truong, John) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 21 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by May 19, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/22/2021. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/19/2021. (nbn) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-2222NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney John Truong (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-05-1923Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 05/19/2021)
2021-05-20MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 23 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by July 19, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/20/2021. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 05/20/2021)
2021-05-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2021. (nbn) (Entered: 05/20/2021)
2021-07-1924Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/19/2021)
2021-07-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 24 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by September 20, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/19/2021. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/19/2021)
2021-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2021. (nbn) (Entered: 07/20/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar