Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01063
Date Filed2020-04-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services, the National Institutes of Health, the FDA, and the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning directives on how to respond to press inquiries pertaining to the coronavirus. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DefendantNATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ALLERGY AND INFECTIOUS DISEASES
DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-231COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ALLERGY AND INFECTIOUS DISEASES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7051401) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to USAG, # 4 Summons as to HHS, # 5 Summons as to FDA, # 6 Summons as to NIAID, # 7 Summons as to CMS)(Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 04/23/2020)
2020-04-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 04/23/2020)
2020-04-23Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/23/2020)
2020-04-233SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ALLERGY AND INFECTIOUS DISEASES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/23/2020)
2020-05-214NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-215NOTICE Of Filing Motion to Consolidate by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ALLERGY AND INFECTIOUS DISEASES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/5/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/4/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/5/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES served on 5/4/2020; FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 5/4/2020; NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ALLERGY AND INFECTIOUS DISEASES served on 5/22/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 5/4/2020 (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar