Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01064
Date Filed2020-04-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services and the FDA for records concerning communications pertaining to coronavirus testing. The request specified a list of individuals and keywords. American Oversight also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-231COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7051464) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons as to USAO, # 4 Summons as to USAG, # 5 Summons as to HHS, # 6 Summons as to FDA)(Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 04/23/2020)
2020-04-232LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 04/23/2020)
2020-04-23Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/23/2020)
2020-04-233SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/23/2020)
2020-05-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/18/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/17/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/18/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 4/28/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 5/18/2020 (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-215NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-216NOTICE Of Filing Motion to Consolidate by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar