Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGROENENDAL v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01030
Date Filed2020-04-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffJACK ALAN GROENENDAL
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS
DefendantOFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY of U.S. Department of Justice
DefendantI.C.E. OFFICE OF INFORMATION, GOVERNANCE, AND PRIVACY of the Department of Homeland Security
DefendantPRIVACY OFFICE OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-16Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 04/16/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-04-161COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR U.S. ATTORNEYS, I.C.E. OFFICE OF INFORMATION, GOVERNANCE, AND PRIVACY, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, PRIVACY OFFICE OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY filed by JACK ALAN GROENENDAL. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(zsb) (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-04-162MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (See docket entry 1 to view document) by JACK ALAN GROENENDAL (zsb) (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-04-233MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JACK ALAN GROENENDAL (zsb) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-04-284PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/28/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-05-055AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by JACK ALAN GROENENDAL.(zsb) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar