Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWindom v. Environmental Protection Agency et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv02826
Date Filed2020-04-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffCameron Windom
Case DescriptionCameron Windom submitted FOIA requests to the EPA, the Department of Health and Human Services, and the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning the Guns and Fists Newsletter. The agencies failed to respond and Windom filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantEnvironmental Protection Agency
DefendantDepartment of Health and Human Services
DefendantDepartment of Housing and Urban Development
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-231COMPLAINT against Department of Health and Human Services, Department of Housing and Urban Development, Environmental Protection Agency. Filed byCameron Windom. Consent/Declination due by 5/7/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-04-232Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-04-233MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cameron Windom. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-05-074CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cameron Windom.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar