Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMCWATTERS v. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01092
Date Filed2020-04-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffKEN MCWATTERS
Case DescriptionKen McWatters submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, and Firearms for records concerning an audio recording of the Station Nightclub Fire incident in West Warwick, Rhode Island in 2003. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. McWatters contacted the agency several times to check on the status of his request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, McWatter filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-271COMPLAINT against ATF ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7063060) filed by JEFF MCWATTERS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-272NOTICE of Errata by JEFF MCWATTERS (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons summons x 3)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-28Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-04-28SUMMONS Not Issued as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES.....INCORRECT SUMMONS FILED. (zsb) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-04-283REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE (corrected) filed by KEN MCWATTERS.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-04-294SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar