Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleStahlman v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityOrlando
Case Number6:2020cv00733
Date Filed2020-04-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Wendy W. Berger
PlaintiffJohn David Stahlman
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-271MOTION to Compel Release of Requested Record(s) Pursuant to Movant's Freedom of Information Act Request by John David Stahlman. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-D)(SPM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-04-272MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by John David Stahlman. (SPM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-04-303RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/30/2020. (RMF)ctp (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-04-304NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/30/2020. (RMF)ctp (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-05-075NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by John David Stahlman. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(DMA) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-05-116ORDER denying without prejudice 1 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Release of Requested Record(s) Pursuant to Movant's Freedom of Information Act Request; denying without prejudice 2 Plaintiff's Motion to Request Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 5/11/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Complaint for a Civil Case, # 2 Exhibit B - Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form)) (RMN) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar