Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTOBIAS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01110
Date Filed2020-04-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJIMMY TOBIAS
Case DescriptionJimmy Tobias, a reporter, submitted six FOIA requests to the Department of Interior for records concerning various agency officials who had previously worked as industry lobbyists. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further pertaining to any of his requests, Tobias filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-281COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7068434) filed by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Civil Cover Sheet, # 15 Summons)(Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-04-282NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-04-283NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-04-29Case assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmc) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-04-294SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-06-085ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR.(Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-06-08MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by June 22, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/8/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/22/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-06-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 5/6/2020 (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/7/2020. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-188RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/7/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/6/2020. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-229Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 9 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by August 21, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/22/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-08-2110Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 08/21/2020)
2020-08-21MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 10 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by October 20, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/21/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/21/2020)
2020-08-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/20/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 08/21/2020)
2020-10-2011Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-20MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 11 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by December 21, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/20/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-12-2112Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 12 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by February 19, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/22/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2020-12-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/19/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2021-02-1913Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 13 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by April 20, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/19/2021. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar