Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMUSLIM ADVOCATES et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01143
Date Filed2020-05-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffMUSLIM ADVOCATES
PlaintiffNAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC.
Case DescriptionMuslim Advocates and the NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State and U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning how Proclamation 9983 implementing the Trump administration's extreme vetting policy for immigrants had been implemented and enforced. Muslim Advocates also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Muslim Advocates and the NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantCUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
1300 PENNSYLVANIA AVENUE NW
WASHINGTON, DC 20004
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-011COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7082058) filed by MUSLIM ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons DOS Summons, # 11 Summons CBP Summons)(Azmi, Nimra) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-05-012NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MUSLIM ADVOCATES. Case related to Case No. 18-1546. (Azmi, Nimra) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-05-04Case assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmc) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-043SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-054NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Spital on behalf of NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC. (Spital, Samuel) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-055MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ashok Chandran, Filing fee $ 100. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ashok Chandran, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spital, Samuel) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-06MINUTE ORDER: Granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ashok Chandran is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff NAACP Legal Defense & Educ. Fund, Inc. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/6/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-116NOTICE of Appearance by Ashok Chandran on behalf of NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC. (Chandran, Ashok) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-267LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MUSLIM ADVOCATES, NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC. (Azmi, Nimra) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-268RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/26/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/25/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/26/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 5/26/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/26/2020 (Azmi, Nimra) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar