Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01146
Date Filed2020-05-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher, which represents veterans and their families killed or wounded by terrorist attacks in Afghanistan, submitted eight FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning specific identified agency records relevant to their representation of veterans and their families. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, Willkie Farr & Gallagher filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Defendant2255
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
2201 C Street NW
Washington, DC 20520
202-647-4000
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7083143) filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1 - Request F-2020-05124, # 6 Exhibit 2 - Request F-2020-05126, # 7 Exhibit 3 - Request F-2020-05127, # 8 Exhibit 4 - Request F-2020-05128, # 9 Exhibit 5 - Request F-2020-05129, # 10 Exhibit 6 - Request F-2020-05130, # 11 Exhibit 7 - Request F-2020-05131, # 12 Exhibit 8 - Request F-2020-05132, # 13 Exhibit 9 - Willkie April 1 2020 Letter, # 14 Exhibit 10 - Request F-2020-05124 Acknowledgment, # 15 Exhibit 11 - Request F-2020-05127 Acknowledgment, # 16 Exhibit 12 - Request F-2020-05128 Acknowledgment, # 17 Exhibit 13 - Willkie April 9 2020 Letter, # 18 Exhibit 14 - Request F-2020-05126 Acknowledgment, # 19 Exhibit 15 - Request F-2020-05129 Acknowledgment, # 20 Exhibit 16 - Request F-2020-05130 Acknowledgment, # 21 Exhibit 17 - Request F-2020-05131 Acknowledgment, # 22 Exhibit 18 - Request F-2020-05132 Acknowledgment, # 23 Exhibit 19 - Willkie April 15 2020 Letter, # 24 Exhibit 20 - State Dept. April 22 2020 Letter)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-05-012LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-05-04Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar