Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleImmigration Center for Women and Children et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv03000
Date Filed2020-04-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffImmigration Center for Women and Children
PlaintiffASISTA Immigration Assistance, Inc.
Case DescriptionImmigration Center for Women and Children and Asista Immigration Assistance submitted FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the discretionary adjudication of adjustment of status for non-immigrants. ICWC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency granted ICWC's request for a fee waiver and put its request on the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further, ICWC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-301COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Under the Freedom of Information Act against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14427231.). Filed byImmigration Center for Women and Children, ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Marc Van Der Hout, # 3 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 4 Exhibit Automatic Reply, # 5 Exhibit Receipt Notice, # 6 Exhibit USCIS FOIA Case Status, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Der Hout, Marc) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-04-302NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Van Der Hout (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Appearance for Johnny Sinodis)(Van Der Hout, Marc) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-04-303Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Van Der Hout, Marc) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-04-304Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Van Der Hout, Marc) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-05-015Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/15/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-05-046Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-047Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-158CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Inc., Immigration Center for Women and Children.. (Van Der Hout, Marc) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-05-199Summons Issued as to United States Attorney General, Office of the United States Attorney. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar