Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01149
Date Filed2020-05-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffDAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe Daily Caller News Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the National Institutes of Health for records concerning for communications to and from Dr. Anthony Fauci and deputy director H. Clifford Lane two doctors from the World Health Organization pertaining to the corona virus. DCNF also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted DCNF's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, DCNF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-041COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7085415) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-04Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-044STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 4, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/11/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/11/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/10/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 5/11/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-06-106NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Bickford on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Bickford, James) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-107ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES.(Bickford, James) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-11MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before July 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 11, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/11/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-07-108Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before August 11, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 10, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/11/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-08-119Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 11, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 12, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/11/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-09-1110Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 21, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 13, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 09/13/2020)
2020-09-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/21/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-2111Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-22MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the defendant shall process 300 pages of potentially responsive records per month, with an initial processing deadline of October 21, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 22, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-22Set/Reset Deadlines: initial processing deadline due by 10/21/2020. (zjch) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-23MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to file, on or October 23, 2020, a joint status report updating the court on the status of this case. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 23, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/23/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-10-2312Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 27, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 26, 2020. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/27/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2021-01-2713Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-28MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before May 3, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 28, 2021. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-01-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/3/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar