Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01153
Date Filed2020-05-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionEnergy Policy Advocates submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning emails sent to three named officials with a list of keywords. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Energy Policy Advocates filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-041COMPLAINT FILED BY ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY 20-1153 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7086579) filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, # 2 Summons SUMMONS DF USEPA, # 3 Summons SUMMONS USA DC, # 4 Summons SUMMONS USAG DoJ, # 5 Declaration LCvR 26.1 Certification)(Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-042ERRATA CORRECTED COMPLAINT by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Complaint)(Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-043LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES (adh, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-044ERRATA Corrected Complaint by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Signed Complaint)(Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-05Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-055SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/12/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/11/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 5/13/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/12/2020. (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 05/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar