Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01158
Date Filed2020-05-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Interior for records concerning Cliven Bundy and the Bundy militia. The agency acknowledged the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT NEVADA STATE OFFICE
DefendantNATIONAL PARK SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-041COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT NEVADA STATE OFFICE, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7087877) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Bureau of the Land Management, # 3 Summons Bureau of Land Management Nevada State Office, # 4 Summons National Park Service, # 5 Summons U.S. Department of the Interior)(Wolf, Douglas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/5/2020) (zmc). (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-042ENTERED IN ERROR.....LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Wolf, Douglas) Modified on 5/5/2020 (zmc). (Entered: 05/04/2020)
2020-05-05NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 2 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests was entered in error due to incomplete form and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (zmc) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-05Case assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmc) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-053SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT NEVADA STATE OFFICE, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-064STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 6, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-065LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-076CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY . (Wolf, Douglas) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar